CA AB620 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6407, 17929, 22355, 22452, 22454, and 22457 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to county clerks.
Title
County clerks: recordkeeping: registrations.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Assembly - AB 620 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB620 John A. Perez By Corbett (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 620 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB620 John A. Perez By Corbett (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 620 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 3080.) | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2065.) | |
2009-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-17 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-25 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1544.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17929 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22457 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |