CA AB624 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 801 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: transfer to court of criminal jurisdiction: appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB624 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 624 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 624 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.). |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1624.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 801 | New Code | See Bill Text |