CA AB658 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 14.5 (commencing with Section 18856) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxpayer contributions: California Police Activities
Sponsors
Asm. Mary Hayashi [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-17 - Assembly - AB 658 HAYASHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB658 Hayashi By Wolk (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Assembly - AB 658 Hayashi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB658 Hayashi By Wolk (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Assembly - AB 658 Hayashi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-17 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6294.) | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 4493.) | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2010-03-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-01-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 3862.) | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). | |
2010-01-14 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-13 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 11). | |
2010-01-11 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3746.) | |
2010-01-07 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |
2010-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18856 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |