CA AB658 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1345, 1348, 1425, 1430, 1431, 1435, 1440, 1441, 1442, and 1704.4 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 1435) of Part 2 of Division 2 of, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 1425) to Chapter 6.5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 1435) to Chapter 6.6 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 1433) to Chapter 6.5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 1443) to Chapter 6.6 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water rights: water management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 658 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2028.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code1242Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1345Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1348Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1425New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code1430Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1431Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1435Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1440Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1441Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1442Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1704.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback