CA AB744 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 13988) to Part 4.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to intellectual property.
Title
Intellectual Property.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 744 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB744 John A. Pérez By Wright (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Assembly - AB 744 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB744 John A. Pérez By Wright (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Assembly - AB 744 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 6581.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4900.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. | |
2012-01-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 3626.) | |
2012-01-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-01-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13988 | New Code | See Bill Text |