CA AB839 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15432 of the Government Code, relating to residential care facilities for the elderly, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Residential care facilities for the elderly: financing.
Sponsors
Asm. Dawn Addis [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 839 Addis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB839 Addis By Alvarado-Gil (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 839 Addis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB839 Addis By Alvarado-Gil (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 839 Addis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3024.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2358.). |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1365.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15432 | Amended Code | Citation Text |