CA AB860 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3019.7, 3020, and 15101 of, and to add Sections 3000.5 and 3016.7 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Assembly - AB 860 Berman Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB860 Berman et al. By Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 860 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB860 Berman et al. By Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 860 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 4915.). |
2020-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 3679.). |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 9). |
2020-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-04-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 15101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3000.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 3016.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 3019.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |