CA AB903 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19911 and 19921 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Gambling Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 903 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 903 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1443.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17539.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |