CA AB910 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14715.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: dispute resolution.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 910 Wood Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3941.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14715.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |