CA AB911 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 714.6 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Unlawfully restrictive covenants: affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 911 Schiavo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB911 Schiavo By Blakespear (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 911 Schiavo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB911 Schiavo By Blakespear (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 911 Schiavo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 3238.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2549.). |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HOUSING. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 1994.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 17). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 12). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 714.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |