CA AB965 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 99520, 99522, and 99523 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 71100, 71101, 71103, and 71103.5 of, and to add Section 71103.6 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 7048 and 79737 of the Water Code, relating to the California-Mexico border.
Title
California and Mexico border: water resources improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 965 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB965 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 965 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB965 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 965 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2807.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2346.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1721.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 99520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 99522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 99523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71103.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71103.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 7048 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 79717 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 79737 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 79737.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |