CA ACA16 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 3.5 to Article I thereof, relating to the environment.
Title
Environmental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |