CA ACR145 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to highways.
Title
Faces of Freedom Veterans Memorial: highway signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR145 Achadjian By Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-05 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - ACR 145 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-05 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - ACR 145 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4649.) |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |