CA ACR165 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Family Physician Week.
Title
Family Physician Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |