CA ACR169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Women in Construction Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Women in Construction Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Assembly - ACR 169 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-05SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2020-03-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
2020-02-27AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 27).
2020-02-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-02-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-19AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-02-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback