CA AJR12 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-17)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Tijuana River.
Title
Tijuana River: cross-border pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Assembly - AJR 12 Alvarez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 20). |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Amended. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |