CA AR28 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-22-1)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4622.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4622.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to humane education.
Title
Relative to humane education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4622.). |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | Introduced. |