CA SB100 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2023.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 1248, 1248.15, 1248.2, 1248.25, 1248.35, 1248.5, 1248.7, and 1248.85 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB100 Price Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 100 Price Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB100 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 100 Price Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB100 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2152.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-07-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-01 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2166.) | |
2011-06-27 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1220.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1112.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 847.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. | |
2011-01-12 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2023.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2027.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1204.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1204.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1204.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1248.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1279 | Amended Code | Citation Text |