CA SB1020 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13658 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement agency regulations.
Title
Law enforcement agency regulations: shooting range targets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3637.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13658 | New Code | See Bill Text |