CA SB1046 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42656 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Organic waste reduction: program environmental impact report: small and medium compostable material handling facilities or operations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1046 Laird (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | April 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | April 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3379.) (March 20). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42656 | New Code | See Bill Text |