CA SB1085 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 893, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 893, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3558.8 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employees: leaves of absence: exclusive bargaining representative service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1085 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1085 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1085 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON Amend By CALDERON Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1085 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1085 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1085 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON Amend By CALDERON Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1085 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 893, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5957.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6708.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 6473.) |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3558.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |