CA SB1123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 368.5 of the Penal Code, relating to elder and dependent adult abuse.
Title
Elder and dependent adult abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1123 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1123 Chang Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1123 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1123 Chang Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1123 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3569.) (May 20). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 368.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |