CA SB1137 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 200 and 210.2 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 12920 and 12926 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination claims: intersectionality of characteristics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | April 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 210.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |