CA SB1140 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 834, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 834, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 400 of the Family Code, relating to marriage.
Title
Marriage.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Michael Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1140 Leno Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1140 Leno Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1140 Leno (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1140 Leno Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1140 Leno (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 834, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 4970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6441.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-11 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-31 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3735.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |
2012-04-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing May 1. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |