CA SB1140 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53398.50, 53398.52, 53398.61, 53398.64, 53398.66, 53398.68, and 62302 of, and to add Sections 53398.72 and 53398.73 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Enhanced infrastructure financing district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3380.) (March 20). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.Q. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53398.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 62302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |