CA SB1184 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5325.2, 5332, 5334, and 5336 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: involuntary treatment: antipsychotic medication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3380.) (March 20). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5325.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5332 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5334 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5336 | Amended Code | Citation Text |