CA SB1193 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 21710) to Part 1 of Division 9 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to aviation.
Title
Airports: leaded aviation gasoline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 3. Page 3535.) (April 9). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 21710 | New Code | See Bill Text |