CA SB1201 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Set for hearing May 16.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Set for hearing May 16.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1502, 2117, 17702.09, 18200, 18205, and 18210 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Beneficial owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3658.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3448.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 1502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 17702.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 18200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 18205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 18210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 2117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |