CA SB1236 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1358.25 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10192.25 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Medicare supplement coverage: open enrollment periods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1358.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10192.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |