CA SB1282 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12860 to, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 14085) to Chapter 3 of Division 7 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticides: neonicotinoids: labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1282 Leno Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1282 Leno (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1282 Leno (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 18. Page 4153.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4153.) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4007.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 12860 | New Code | See Bill Text |