CA SB1283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 148.2 to the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Section 21650 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation: state highways: transit bus pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 148.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 21650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1283 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1283 |