CA SB1295 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 662 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Automobile insurance: notice of cancellation.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |