CA SB1360 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 101, 107, 9008, 9020, 9105, 9203, and 11043 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 84502, 84503, 84504.1, 84504.2, 84504.3, and 84505 of, and to add Section 84504.8 to, the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: disclosure of contributors.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1360 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1360 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1360 Umberg et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1360 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1360 Umberg et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5306.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 3914.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3794.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3237.) (March 28). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |