CA SB1373 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 12411) to Chapter 2 of Part 4.9 of Division 6 of the Water Code, relating to water data.
Title
Water data dashboard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12411 | New Code | See Bill Text |