CA SB1375 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1198.5 of the Labor Code, and to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 14535) to Division 7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Workforce development: records: poverty-reducing standards: funds, programs, reporting, and analyses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 14535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1198.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |