CA SB1391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 84810.5 of, and to add Section 84810.7 to, the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: inmate education programs: computation of apportionments.
Sponsors
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Mark Wyland [R] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1391 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1391 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1391 Hancock (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1391 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1391 Hancock (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6549.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3610.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3256.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in PUB. S. pending receipt. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 84810.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84810.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |