CA SB1393 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - April 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3468.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - April 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3468.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 43850) to Chapter 4 of Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
Advanced Clean Fleets Regulation Appeals Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-03-2024]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3468.) Reconsideration granted. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43850 | New Code | See Bill Text |