CA SB145 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3600 and 4663 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB145 DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 145 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By SOLORIO (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB145 DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 145 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By SOLORIO (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB145 DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4919.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6518.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-18 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2010-08-17 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans. | |
2009-07-13 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on INS. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1113.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-03-26 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 347.) | |
2009-03-17 | Set for hearing March 25. | |
2009-02-23 | To Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | |
2009-02-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |