CA SB1500 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 50199.24, 50517.11, 50675.16, 53545.11, 53559.4, 53567, and 53601 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 987.011 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Housing: federal waiver: income eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | May 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3703.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3633.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and M. & V.A. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50199.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50517.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50675.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53545.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53559.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53567 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53601 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 987.011 | New Code | See Bill Text |