CA SB269 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25607 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licensed premises: retail sales and consumption.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB269 Laird (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Assembly - SB 269 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB269 Laird (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Assembly - SB 269 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB269 Laird (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2182.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2742.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 700.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 340.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |