CA SB310 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53395.14 of, to add Section 53393.3.5 to, and to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 65470) to Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, relating to local development.
Title
Local development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB310 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 310 Hancock Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Hancock (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 310 Hancock Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Hancock (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2451.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 3047.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-31 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2736.) . Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2630.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-29 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-05-27 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 1033.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 762.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |