CA SB310 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11.7 (commencing with Section 4169.7) to Chapter 9 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Division 117 (commencing with Section 150400) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Unused medications: cancer medication recycling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB310 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 310 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Burke (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Rubio et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 310 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Burke (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Rubio et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2608.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2914.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 6). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4169.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 150400 | New Code | See Bill Text |