CA SB329 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76140 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: nonresident tuition: Lake Tahoe
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |