CA SB362 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1777.7 and 3075 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-04-27 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 766.) | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1777.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |