CA SB362 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 336.7 and 3021.5 to the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Voting procedures: natural disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB362 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 362 Padilla Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Padilla (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 362 Padilla Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Padilla (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2037.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 2712.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 945.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13). |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 19006 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 3021.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 336.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |