CA SB384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.6.10 to the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 17152 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-10-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 651.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ., and JUD. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |