CA SB413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 370, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 370, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 406, 505, 507, and 508 of, and to repeal Section 711 of, the San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority Act (Chapter 776 of the Statutes of 1992), relating to the San Gabriel Water Quality Authority.
Title
San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB413 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 413 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Chau (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB413 Rubio et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 413 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Chau (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB413 Rubio et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 370, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2327.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 921.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |