CA SB427 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1342.74 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 10123.1933 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: antiretroviral drugs, drug devices, and drug products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Assembly - SB 427 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Zbur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB427 Portantino (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB427 Portantino (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4746.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Zbur. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Zbur. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1170.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 940.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1342.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.1933 | Amended Code | Citation Text |