CA SB503 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1418.8 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Long-term health facilities: informed consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - SB 503 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BROWN Amend By BROWN Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB503 Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB503 Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | August 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5596.) From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5598.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1204.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1155.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 11). |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 861.) (April 29). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1366.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1366.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1366.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1418.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 24100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10128.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10128.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10128.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |