CA SB522 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 110, 201, 2601, 5008, 5122, 7122, 9122, 10010, 10013, 12214, 12302, 13409, 15901.08, and 17701.08 of the Corporations Code, relating to business entities.
Title
Business entities: filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 522 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB522 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB522 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB522 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB522 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3130.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3098.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3088.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15 in B. & F.I. pending receipt. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 10010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 10013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 12214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 12302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 13409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 15901.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 17701.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 2601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 7122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 9122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |